MN HF2500 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Bennett
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Bennett
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Organ harvesting; a resolution calling for the end of Falun Gong practitioners' cold genocide and forced organ harvesting.
Title
Organ harvesting; a resolution calling for the end of Falun Gong practitioners' cold genocide and forced organ harvesting.
Sponsors
Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] |
Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] |
Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] |
Sen. Tou Xiong [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. John Heinrich [R] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] |
Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Author added Bennett |
2019-04-26 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn and Halverson |
2019-04-11 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-04-10 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-04-05 | House | Authors added McDonald and Bahr |
2019-04-04 | House | Authors added Hamilton, Scott, Heinrich, and Bernardy |
2019-04-03 | House | Authors added Lillie and Bahner |
2019-03-28 | House | Authors added Franson and Xiong, T. |
2019-03-27 | House | Authors added Masin, Noor, Davnie, Sandstede, Bierman, Zerwas, and Ecklund |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Mariani |
2019-03-20 | House | Authors added Vang, Urdahl, and Dehn |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2416 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Author added Eaton