MN HF2525 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Cantrell and Acomb
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Cantrell and Acomb
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Duluth; Life House and the Link grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Duluth; Life House and the Link grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] |
Rep. Patty Acomb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Authors added Cantrell and Acomb |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2682 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy