MN HF2526 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Author added Klevorn
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - Author added Klevorn
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Housing mediation eviction prevention program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Housing mediation eviction prevention program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] |
Rep. Duane Sauke [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | Author added Klevorn |
2020-03-16 | House | Author added Moller |
2020-03-12 | House | Authors added Acomb and Sauke |
2020-02-13 | House | Author changed Her (chief author) |
2019-04-12 | House | Author added Lippert |
2019-04-10 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2019-04-05 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-03-28 | House | Author added Davnie |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-18 | House | Authors added Jurgens, Hassan, and Gomez |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2775 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance