MN HF2574 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Author added Dettmer.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Author added Dettmer.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Rare diseases advisory council establishment requested to provide advice on issues related to rare diseases, and money appropriated.
Title
Rare diseases advisory council establishment requested to provide advice on issues related to rare diseases, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2018-04-23 | House | Author added Johnson, C. |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2018-03-21 | House | Author added Flanagan. |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Pryor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Authors added Rosenthal; Carlson, A.; and Lee. |
2018-03-01 | House | Authors added Kresha, Hansen, Masin, and Applebaum. |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2018-02-20 | House | Author added Thissen. |
2017-05-18 | House | Author added Murphy, E. |
2017-04-04 | House | Author added Youakim. |
2017-04-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2786 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy