MN HF2621 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Authors added Persell and Poston
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Authors added Persell and Poston
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Otter Tail County; Fergus Falls building debt service grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Otter Tail County; Fergus Falls building debt service grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Authors added Persell and Poston |
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Backer |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF2599 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Author added Eken