MN HF2690 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Authors added Runbeck and Poston.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Authors added Runbeck and Poston.
Pending: House Government Operations and Elections Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal government; a resolution memorializing Congress to call a convention to propose amendments to the Constitution to impose fiscal constraints on the federal government, limit power, and limit terms of office.
Title
Federal government; a resolution memorializing Congress to call a convention to propose amendments to the Constitution to impose fiscal constraints on the federal government, limit power, and limit terms of office.
Sponsors
Rep. Duane Quam [R] | Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] |
Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Abigail Whelan [R] |
Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] |
Rep. Bob Vogel [R] | Rep. Matthew Dean [R] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] |
Rep. John Poston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Authors added Runbeck and Poston. |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Munson. |
2018-03-01 | House | Author added Dean, M. |
2018-02-20 | House | Author added Vogel. |
2017-05-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3490 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections