MN HF2697 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 51
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 51
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Claims against the state settlement provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Claims against the state settlement provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 51 | |
2019-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-19 | House | Returned from Senate |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2644 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2644, now on General Orders |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-05-10 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 10, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-27 | House | Recalled by Chair Ways and Means |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2644 (Similar To) 2019-05-14 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2697