MN HF28 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm transfer criminal background checks required.
Title
Firearm transfer criminal background checks required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Sandstede |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Carlson, L. |
2019-01-28 | House | Authors added Bierman, Elkins, and Bernardy |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-01-14 | House | Author added Youakim |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |