MN HF2806 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clemency Review Commission established.
Title
Clemency Review Commission established.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Moller |
2020-02-27 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2761 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy