MN HF2825 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Miller
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Miller
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vaccines; a resolution memorializing the President and Congress to hold vaccine manufacturers liable for design defects that result in adverse side effects from vaccines.
Title
Vaccines; a resolution memorializing the President and Congress to hold vaccine manufacturers liable for design defects that result in adverse side effects from vaccines.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Rep. John Heinrich [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Miller |
2019-04-10 | House | Author added Franson |
2019-04-09 | House | Author stricken Heintzeman |
2019-04-09 | House | Author added Lucero |
2019-04-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2781 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy