MN HF2836 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Green New Deal established, and reports required.
Title
Minnesota Green New Deal established, and reports required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-05-20 | House | Authors added Kunesh-Podein, Christensen, and Moran. |
2019-05-19 | House | Authors added Freiberg and Liebling |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division |
2019-04-12 | House | Authors added Noor and Xiong, J. |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF3143 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance