MN HF284 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insulin products sold in Minnesota cost review authorized by commissioner of health, excessive cost determined, maximum level of reimbursement established for insulin products if necessary, and money appropriated.
Title
Insulin products sold in Minnesota cost review authorized by commissioner of health, excessive cost determined, maximum level of reimbursement established for insulin products if necessary, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Persell |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-01-24 | House | Authors added Loeffler and Dehn |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF364 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy