MN HF2849 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 34 05/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 34 05/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Argosy University closure student relief provided, and report required.
Title
Argosy University closure student relief provided, and report required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2849 (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 34 05/17/2019 | |
2019-05-17 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-17 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Motion prevailed |
2019-05-16 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2019-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2019-05-15 | House | House rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2841 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2841, now on General Orders |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-05-10 | House | Authors added Masin and Halverson |
2019-05-09 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-09 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 09, 2019 |
2019-05-07 | House | Second reading |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-05-02 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2019-04-26 | House | Authors added Nornes, Pryor, Edelson, Lillie, Lien, Daniels, Layman, Klevorn, Moran, Gomez, Vang, and Runbeck |
2019-04-26 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred by Chair to Higher Education Finance and Policy Division |
2019-04-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2841 (Similar To) 2019-05-14 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2849