MN HF285 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Human Services and Metropolitan Council data sharing for transportation purposes authorized.
Title
Department of Human Services and Metropolitan Council data sharing for transportation purposes authorized.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: H.F. NO. 285 (Y: 52 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-04-03 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-04-01 | House | Recalled by Chair Ways and Means |
2019-01-28 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion did not prevail Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF486 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy