MN HF2855 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled Veterans Rest Camp improvement funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Disabled Veterans Rest Camp improvement funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] |
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] |
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. John Heinrich [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-04-26 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2863 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Author added Bigham