MN HF288 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health plan companies prohibited from removing coverage of insulin or equipment and supplies during an enrollee's contract year.
Title
Health plan companies prohibited from removing coverage of insulin or equipment and supplies during an enrollee's contract year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Bahner and Bernardy |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF365 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy