MN HF2886 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minneapolis; Grand Rounds Missing Link trail connection phase I completion funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Minneapolis; Grand Rounds Missing Link trail connection phase I completion funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] |
Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Jordan |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-05-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2869 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Referred to Capital Investment