MN HF300 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Judicial jurisdiction for public procurement action disputes specified.
Title
Judicial jurisdiction for public procurement action disputes specified.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-04-09 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF558 |
2019-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF558 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Secretary of State Chapter 21 05/09/2019