MN HF322 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Author added Heintzeman.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Author added Heintzeman.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Governmental units allowed to sue to recover costs related to unlawful assemblies and public nuisances.
Title
Governmental units allowed to sue to recover costs related to unlawful assemblies and public nuisances.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] |
Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] |
Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Brian Johnson [R] |
Rep. Mark Uglem [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] |
Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] |
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Matthew Dean [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] |
Rep. Bob Loonan [R] | Rep. Abigail Whelan [R] | Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] | Rep. Jim Newberger [R] |
Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Author added Heintzeman. |
2017-02-15 | House | Author added Newberger. |
2017-01-26 | House | Author added Grossell. |
2017-01-26 | House | Author stricken Franke. |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
2017-01-23 | House | Authors added Lucero, Nornes, Loonan, and Whelan. |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF679 (Similar To) 2017-02-06 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy