MN HF3230 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electric utility program that encourages efficient lighting amended to include LED promotion.
Title
Electric utility program that encourages efficient lighting amended to include LED promotion.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] |
Rep. Tony Albright [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State Chapter 105 | |
2020-05-27 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-27 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-27 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-05-16 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-16 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 16, 2020 |
2020-05-11 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-09 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3331 (Similar To) 2020-05-17 - HF substituted HF3230