MN HF3392 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Higher Education policy changes provided, including financial aid, institutional approval, and Minnesota college savings plan; fees established and increased; and report required.
Title
Office of Higher Education policy changes provided, including financial aid, institutional approval, and Minnesota college savings plan; fees established and increased; and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2020-05-15 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-14 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3683 |
2020-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 15, 2020 |
2020-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3683 (Similar To) 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed