MN HF34 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Author added Heinrich
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Author added Heinrich
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State contracts with state sponsors of terrorism and foreign terrorist organizations prohibited.
Title
State contracts with state sponsors of terrorism and foreign terrorist organizations prohibited.
Sponsors
Rep. John Poston [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] |
Sen. Steve Green [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. John Heinrich [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2019-01-17 | House | Author added Zerwas |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF832 (Similar To) 2019-02-04 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections