MN HF352 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Authors added Backer and Petersburg
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Authors added Backer and Petersburg
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employees granted the right to work without being required to become a member or pay fees to a labor organization, penalties and jurisdiction created, and other unfair labor practices provided.
Title
Employees granted the right to work without being required to become a member or pay fees to a labor organization, penalties and jurisdiction created, and other unfair labor practices provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Authors added Backer and Petersburg |
2019-02-25 | House | Authors added Runbeck and Anderson |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Mekeland |
2019-02-04 | House | Authors added Nornes, Daniels, Hertaus, and Gruenhagen. |
2019-01-31 | House | Authors added Green, Heinrich, Lucero |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor |