MN HF3903 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement; various provisions changed relating to the Public Employees Retirement Association, Minnesota State Retirement System, firefighter plan, Teachers Retirement Association, volunteer firefighter relief associations, fire state aid, and others.
Title
Retirement; various provisions changed relating to the Public Employees Retirement Association, Minnesota State Retirement System, firefighter plan, Teachers Retirement Association, volunteer firefighter relief associations, fire state aid, and others.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Murphy [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2020-05-15 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-14 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3808 |
2020-05-14 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-14 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-05-14 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF3808 (Similar To) 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed