MN HF399 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Secretary of State Chapter 100 02/27/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Secretary of State Chapter 100 02/27/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Senate and house of representatives funding provided, transfers required, and money appropriated.
Title
Senate and house of representatives funding provided, transfers required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Anderson [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. Jim Knoblach [R] |
Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Regina Barr [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] |
Rep. Jenifer Loon [R] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] |
Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Keith Franke [R] | Rep. Matthew Dean [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] |
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Bob Vogel [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
Rep. Roz Peterson [R] | Rep. Bob Loonan [R] | Sen. Steve Green [R] | Rep. Drew Christensen [R] |
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Kelly Fenton [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] |
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by Conference Committee (Y: 77 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 102 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 102 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Secretary of State Chapter 100 02/27/18 | |
2018-02-27 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-02-26 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-02-26 | Governor approval | |
2018-02-26 | House | Senate concurrence and repassage vote: 38-28 |
2018-02-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 38-28 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Question recurred adopted conference committee report |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Motion to reject CC report, did not prevail |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2018-02-22 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 77-50 |
2018-02-22 | House | Point of order raised, ruled not well taken |
2018-02-22 | House | Point of order raised, ruled not well taken |
2018-02-22 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2018-02-22 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2018-02-22 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2018-02-22 | House | Senate conferees Kiffmeyer; Anderson, B.; Koran; Hall; Laine |
2018-02-22 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate conferees Kiffmeyer; Anderson, B.; Koran; Hall; Laine |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | House conferees Anderson, S.; O'Driscoll; Fenton; Nash; Dettmer |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Bill returned to conference committee in House |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Taken from table in House |
2018-02-20 | House | House conferees Anderson, S.; O'Driscoll; Fenton; Nash; and Dettmer |
2018-02-20 | House | New conference committee of 5 requested |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-02-20 | House | Motion to take from table |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate conferees Kiffmeyer; Anderson, B.; Koran; Hall; Laine |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2017-05-18 | House | House conferees Anderson, S; O'Driscoll; Fenton; Nash; and Dettmer. |
2017-05-18 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-05-18 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate conferees Kiffmeyer; Anderson, B.; Koran; Hall; Laine |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2017-05-18 | Senate | House conferees Anderson, S.; O'Driscoll; Fenton; Nash; Dettmer |
2017-05-18 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 36-28 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF603 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparision with SF603, now on General Orders |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-05-12 | House | Bill was passed vote: 102-20 |
2017-05-12 | House | Third reading |
2017-05-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 12, 2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF603 (Similar To) 2017-05-16 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF399