MN HF411 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clean water funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Clean water funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Christensen |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-03-13 | House | Recalled by Chair Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred by Chair to Water Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Authors added Bennett and Persell |
2019-02-13 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-01-31 | House | Authors added Calrson, A.; Lueck |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Greater Minnesota Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF587 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Capital Investment