MN HF424 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Lislegard
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Lislegard
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State required to pay costs of property tax judgement against state-assessed property, and money appropriated.
Title
State required to pay costs of property tax judgement against state-assessed property, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Julie Sandstede [D] |
Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lislegard |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Backer |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Lien |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1708 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Taxes