MN HF430 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans defense project grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Veterans defense project grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] |
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-02-19 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF503 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections