MN HF433 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Port development assistance program funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Port development assistance program funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Pelowski [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Mary Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Murphy |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF479 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Capital Investment