MN HF478 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Demuth
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Demuth
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighter post-traumatic stress disorder grants established, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Firefighter post-traumatic stress disorder grants established, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Demuth |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Fischer |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Edelson |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Bennett |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1109 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy