MN HF497 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Grossell
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Grossell
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care providers prohibited from receiving child care assistance program reimbursements for dependents of employees.
Title
Child care providers prohibited from receiving child care assistance program reimbursements for dependents of employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] |
Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Grossell |
2019-02-21 | House | Author changed Dettmer |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Lucero |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |