MN HF498 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Authors added Miller and Grossell
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Authors added Miller and Grossell
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care assistance program disqualifications due to wrongfully obtaining assistance modified.
Title
Child care assistance program disqualifications due to wrongfully obtaining assistance modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Miller and Grossell |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added West |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Dettmer, Heintzeman, Kresha, and Albright |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |