MN HF50 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 11 04/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Cell phone use prohibited by person operating a vehicle while vehicle is in motion or a part of traffic, and voice-activated hands-free mode exception provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cell phone use prohibited by person operating a vehicle while vehicle is in motion or a part of traffic, and voice-activated hands-free mode exception provided.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by Conference (Y: 107 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 107 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 106 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 106 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 53 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23 Secretary of State Chapter 11 04/12/2019
2019-04-12 Governor's action Approval
2019-04-12 Secretary of State, Filed
2019-04-12 Governor approval
2019-04-12 Presented to Governor
2019-04-12HouseSenate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
2019-04-11SenateThird reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate adopted CC report and repassed bill
2019-04-11SenateConference committee report, delete everything
2019-04-11SenateHouse adopted HCC report and repassed bill
2019-04-09HouseBill was repassed as amended by Conference
2019-04-09HouseThird reading as amended by Conference
2019-04-09HouseHouse adopted conference committee report
2019-04-09HouseConference committee report, delete everything
2019-03-27HouseSenate conferees Newman, Jasinski, Carlson
2019-03-27HouseSenate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
2019-03-26SenateSenate conferees Newman; Jasinski; Carlson
2019-03-26SenateSenate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
2019-03-26SenateHouse conferees Hornstein; Noor; Petersburg
2019-03-26SenateHouse not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2019-03-25HouseHouse conferees Hornstein, Noor, Petersburg
2019-03-25HouseHouse refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
2019-03-25HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2019-03-25SenateThird reading Passed
2019-03-25SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2019-03-21SenateSecond reading
2019-03-21SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF91
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF91, now on General Orders
2019-03-20SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-03-20SenateReceived from House
2019-03-18HouseBill was passed
2019-03-18HouseThird reading
2019-03-18HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken
2019-03-18HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken
2019-03-18HouseAmendments offered
2019-03-14HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 18, 2019
2019-03-11HouseSecond reading
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-06HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-02-28HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-26HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-01-31HouseReferred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-22HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-01-14HouseReferred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF91 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF50

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0050&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF50&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF50&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF50&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0050&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10081
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0050&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10082
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=1269
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0050&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10142
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=2747
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0050&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10081
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0050&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10082
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0050&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10142

Bill Comments

feedback