MN HF51 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Protected class restrictive covenants that are prohibited under state and federal law statutory form provided for making declarations.
Title
Protected class restrictive covenants that are prohibited under state and federal law statutory form provided for making declarations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - House - House: Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 45 | |
2019-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-22 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-18 | House | Returned from Senate |
2019-05-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-1 |
2019-05-18 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-02-04 | House | Third reading |
2019-01-31 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, February 4, 2019 |
2019-01-28 | House | Authors added O'Neill and Wolgamott |
2019-01-24 | House | Second reading |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-01-17 | House | Author added Youakim |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF465 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Author added Limmer