MN HF545 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Riverview Corridor Transitway funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Riverview Corridor Transitway funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] |
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-02-04 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF691 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - Referred to Capital Investment