MN HF547 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taylor Hayden Gun Violence Prevention Act established, and money appropriated.
Title
Taylor Hayden Gun Violence Prevention Act established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Schultz |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF464 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Author added Carlson