MN HF55 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-26 - Author added Loonan.
Pending: House Transportation and Regional Governance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-26 - Author added Loonan.
Pending: House Transportation and Regional Governance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Highway obstruction penalties increased.
Title
Highway obstruction penalties increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] | Rep. Kelly Fenton [R] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] |
Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Sen. Steve Green [R] |
Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Mark Uglem [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. Abigail Whelan [R] | Rep. Bob Loonan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | House | Author added Loonan. |
2017-01-23 | House | Author added Whelan. |
2017-01-19 | House | Author added Daniels. |
2017-01-12 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2017-01-09 | House | Authors added Lueck and Uglem. |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF148 (Similar To) 2017-01-30 - Author added Fischbach