MN HF559 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 31 05/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 31 05/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provider-patient relationship required in order to make ophthalmic prescriptions.
Title
Provider-patient relationship required in order to make ophthalmic prescriptions.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 112 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 112 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 31 05/17/2019 | |
2019-05-17 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-17 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF544 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF544, now on General Orders |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-05-07 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Third reading |
2019-05-06 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 07, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-02-14 | House | Authors added Backer, Nornes, and Bierman |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF544 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF559