MN HF589 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Author added Drazkowski
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - Author added Drazkowski
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative per diem precluded.
Title
Legislative per diem precluded.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Drazkowski |
2019-02-04 | House | Author added Bahr |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF132 (Similar To) 2019-01-14 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections