MN HF606 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Student absence from school for religious holidays modified, and employee leave for religious holidays required.
Title
Student absence from school for religious holidays modified, and employee leave for religious holidays required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Jordan |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Scott |
2019-02-14 | House | Authors added Pinto and Her |
2019-02-11 | House | Authors added Noor and Klevorn |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF661 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Author added Cohen