MN HF622 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 30 05/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 30 05/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Real estate broker and licensee advertising requirements modified.
Title
Real estate broker and licensee advertising requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Tim O'Driscoll [R] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 30 05/17/2019 | |
2019-05-17 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-05-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-05-17 | Governor approval | |
2019-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF768 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF768, now on General Orders |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-04-08 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Third reading |
2019-04-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 08, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Lucero |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Garofalo and Dettmer |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Pierson |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF768 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF622