MN HF629 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added West
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added West
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota premium security plan funding operation extended, and information required in submitted reports specified.
Title
Minnesota premium security plan funding operation extended, and information required in submitted reports specified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Author added West |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Author stricken Schultz |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-04 | House | Authors added Garofalo and Haley |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF761 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Motion did not prevail