MN HF67 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Author added Grossell
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Author added Grossell
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Counties ability to file policies of no net gain provided, and land sales required.
Title
Counties ability to file policies of no net gain provided, and land sales required.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Green [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] |
Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Grossell |
2019-01-17 | House | Authors added Garofalo and Lueck |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF590 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance