MN HF676 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Author added Heinrich
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-18 - Author added Heinrich
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Freedom of speech provided, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Title
Freedom of speech provided, and constitutional amendment proposed.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] |
Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Nolan West [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. John Heinrich [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2019-02-07 | House | Authors added West, Poston, Lucero, and Scott |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2380 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy