MN HF679 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 12 04/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 12 04/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children's residential treatment payment provisions effective date amended, and money appropriated.
Title
Children's residential treatment payment provisions effective date amended, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Secretary of State Chapter 12 04/12/2019 | |
2019-04-12 | Governor's action Approval | |
2019-04-12 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2019-04-12 | Governor approval | |
2019-04-12 | Presented to Governor | |
2019-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Special Order |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-03-21 | House | Bill was passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Third reading |
2019-03-20 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-07 | House | Motion prevailed |
2019-03-07 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 11, 2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Second reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Schultz |
2019-02-19 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Authors added Baker and Olson |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Backer |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1131 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - HF substituted in committee HF679