MN HF689 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Probation length for certain offenses modified, and court-granted early termination and discharge of probation clarified.
Title
Probation length for certain offenses modified, and court-granted early termination and discharge of probation clarified.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Nolan West [R] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] |
Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-02-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-05-20 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-04-26 | House | Author added Elkins |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Gomez |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1606 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Author added Newton