MN HF69 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Combined net receipts tax calculation modified.
Title
Combined net receipts tax calculation modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] |
Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Robbins |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Boe |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Haley |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Lien |
2019-01-22 | House | Author added Backer |
2019-01-17 | House | Author added Lueck |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF219 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Taxes