MN HF709 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
County agricultural society sales at county fairs exemption provided.
Title
County agricultural society sales at county fairs exemption provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Backer |
2019-02-11 | House | Author added Bennett |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Layman |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF741 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - Referred to Taxes