MN HF731 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles and watercraft tax and fee exemption for disabled veterans provided.
Title
Motor vehicles and watercraft tax and fee exemption for disabled veterans provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] |
Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Sen. Tou Xiong [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-19 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-05 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF333 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy