MN HF742 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children's and parent's mental health provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Children's and parent's mental health provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Recalled by Chair Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1437 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy